Aesthetica, LLC v. LunchBOX, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Aesthetica, LLC
Defendant: LunchBOX, LLC and Rocketbox, Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2017cv01045
Filed: April 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff/Counter-Defendants' 103 Motion to Compel and 107 Defendants' Emergency Motion to Quash and/or for Protective Order re DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 5/18/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER Temporarily Unsealing Notes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 4/1/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Court Reporter - MR)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER re 107 Motion to Quash. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a Response to the Emergency Motion by noon on 2/19/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 2/13/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER Granting 81 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 67 Motion to Enforce (Fourth Request). Responses due by 10/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 9/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Granting 79 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 67 Motion to Enforce (Third Request). Responses due by 9/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 9/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Granting 63 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 62 Motion to Amend/Correct (First Request). Responses due by 7/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 58 Hope Hamilton, Esq.'s Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Defendants is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for Defendant Lunchbox Wax Holdings, LLC., shall file his Pro Hac Vice application by no later than 4/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting 50 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Joseph G. Went; Emily Joy Cooper and Timothy P. Getzoff withdrawn from the case. ; Defendant Lunchbox Wax Holdings, LLC., shall have until October 29, 2018, to retain counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting 21 Stipulation to Extend Time re 10 Amended Complaint (First Request). Lunchbox Franchise, LLC, Lunchbox Wax Holdings, LLC, and Rocketbox, Ltd. answer due 10/11/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/20/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aesthetica, LLC v. LunchBOX, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aesthetica, LLC
Represented By: John L. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LunchBOX, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rocketbox, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?