Benmelech v. Eldorado Resorts Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Chaim Benmelech
Defendant: Kristen Beck, Eldorado Resorts Corporation, Michael Marrs and Dominic Taleghani
Case Number: 2:2017cv01060
Filed: April 14, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Granting 52 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 4 defendant's partial motion to dismiss be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that claims (3), (5), (7), (9), (10), and (11) of 1 plaintiff 's complaint be, and the same hereby are, DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that claim (6), as it pertains to NRS 608.018, of 1 plaintiff's complaint be, and the same hereby is, DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/1/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting 12 Motion Request for Exception to In-Person Attendance at ENE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/26/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benmelech v. Eldorado Resorts Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristen Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eldorado Resorts Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Marrs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominic Taleghani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chaim Benmelech
Represented By: Brian S. Letofsky
Represented By: Daniel R Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?