Young
Plaintiff: Michael Ray Young
Defendant: State of Nevada
Case Number: 2:2017cv01062
Filed: April 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS Accepting and Adopting 10 Report and Recommendation, denying 8 Motion for Appointment of Counsel and dismissing with prejudice 7 Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Recommending Dismissal of 7 Amended Complaint., denying 8 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Objections to R&R due by 6/26/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/12/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS Accepting and Adopting 4 Report and Recommendation. FURTHER ORDERED that Young's claims brought against Officer Kaylor and Officer Dyer pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1981, 1985, and 1983 DISMISSED with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Young's claims brought against Officer Kaylor and Officer Dyer pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 241, 242, and 245 are DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/1/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Claims against Officer Kaylor and Officer Dyer in their individual capacities brought pursuant to 42 U.S.C. §§ 1981, 1985, and 1983 be DISMISSED with leave t o amend. FURTHER ORDERED that Young must file an amended complaint in accordance with the provisions set forth in this order by 6/2/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/2/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Ray Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?