Messina v. Singh et al
Plaintiff: Victoria Messina
Defendant: H Trucking LLC and Malkiat Singh
Case Number: 2:2017cv01077
Filed: April 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Transferring Case to the District of Arizona for want of jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/25/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Granting in part Defendant's 32 Discovery Motion. Defendant is not required to respond to the document requests by 9/7/2017. The Court will order that Defendant respond to the document requests by the default deadline set by Rule 34(b)(2)(A). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/7/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Denying without prejudice Defendants' 35 Motion for Sanctions re Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/6/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Messina v. Singh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H Trucking LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malkiat Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Messina
Represented By: Vincent J. Aiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?