BOMF IIIB 2014-19NPL1 Corp. v. Moninger et al

Plaintiff: BOMF IIIB 2014-19NPL1 Corp.
Defendant: Asset Recovery Services, Amelita Moninger, Kevin Moninger and Villa Del Oro Owners Association
Case Number: 2:2017cv01106
Filed: April 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition to Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting 43 Motion to Extend Time to Serve Salv and 44 Motion for Service by Publication. Bank of America shall have 60 days after entry of this order to effectuate service on Salv by publication. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting 41 Stipulation that Bank of America, N.A. will be substituted in place and stead of BOMF IIIB 2014-19NPL1 Corp. in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting 34 Stipulation to Join Indispensable Party. FURTHER ORDERED that, in light of the parties' representations herein, as well as the parties' pending settlement conference, (ECF No. 35 ), the Court DENIES the pending dispositive Motions, (ECF Nos. 22 , 25 , 28 ), without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Granting 33 Stipulation to Continue Settlement Conference. sSettlement Conference continued to 11/28/2018 at 09:30 AM in LV Chambers before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Confidential statements shall be due no later than 4:00 p.m. on 11/20/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting 23 Stipulation for Stay Pending Ruling on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the Default entered against Defendant, VILLA DEL ORO OWNERS ASSOCIATION on or about 9/13/17 is hereby set aside. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Defendant, VILLA DEL ORO OWNER S ASSOCIATION shall have 10 days from the date of entry of this Stipulation and Order with the Court to file a responsive pleading to the Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/11/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BOMF IIIB 2014-19NPL1 Corp. v. Moninger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asset Recovery Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amelita Moninger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Moninger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Villa Del Oro Owners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOMF IIIB 2014-19NPL1 Corp.
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Represented By: Natalie L Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?