U.S. Bank Trust v. LN Management, LLC Series 4004 Cape Sand
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Defendant: LN Management, LLC Series 4004 Cape Sand
Case Number: 2:2017cv01109
Filed: April 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 AMENDED ORDER Granting 60 Motion for Release of Funds re 12 CERTIFICATE of Cash Deposit in the amount of $500.00. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; cc: Finance - SLD)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Granting 52 Third Stipulation to Extend Dispositive Motion Deadlines. Motions due by 4/25/2019. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER denying 41 Stipulation; ORDER denying 13 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default ; ORDER denying 15 Motion to Dismiss; The moving party shall have 21 days from the date of the Nevada Supreme Court's decision on the certified question to file a modified Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/23/2018.; Case stayed. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting Defendant's 35 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs. Plaintiff must post a $500.00 security cost bond with the Clerk of Court within fifteen days of this order. This case is STAYED until Plaintiff complies with this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting 30 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) re Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadline. Discovery due by 6/12/2018. Motions due by 7/12/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/10/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting 21 Stipulation to Extend Deadline (First Request) to Amend Pleadings and Add Parties. Deadline: 1/14/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting Defendant's 9 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs in the amount of $500.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/1/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank Trust v. LN Management, LLC Series 4004 Cape Sand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LN Management, LLC Series 4004 Cape Sand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Represented By: Jamie Scott Hendrickson
Represented By: Edgar C Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?