Martino v. BMO Harris Bank, National Association et al
Plaintiff: John P. Martino
Defendant: BMO Harris Bank, National Association, Chase Bank USA, National Association, Equifax Information Services, LLC, One Nevada Credit Union and Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Case Number: 2:2017cv01110
Filed: April 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting 37 Stipulation for Attorneys Fees. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting 33 Stipulation of Dismissal as to One Nevada Credit Union. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/25/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER. The Court STRIKES the document filed at Docket No. 23 and instructs the parties to refrain from filing discovery documents on the docket in the future absent a Court order to do so. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/30/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Denying 10 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 1 Complaint (First Request). See Local Rule IA 6-1(a) (requests to extend must state the reason(s) for the extension sought). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/23/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting 8 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 1 Complaint (First Request). One Nevada Credit Union answer due 5/26/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martino v. BMO Harris Bank, National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMO Harris Bank, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank USA, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Nevada Credit Union
Represented By: Santoro Whitmire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John P. Martino
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?