Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. Resources Group, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Cortez Heights Homeowners Association, G&P Enterprises Nevada, LLC and Resources Group, LLC,
Case Number: 2:2017cv01124
Filed: April 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting Defendant Resources Group, LLC's 34 Renewed Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's claims against all Defendants are DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is instructed to close this case. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting 35 First Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 34 Renewed Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 11/9/2018. Replies due by 12/14/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER that this case is hereby STAYED. Defendant G&P Enterprises Nevada, LLC's 11 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED without prejudice. Defendant Resources Group, LLC's 17 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting 23 Stipulation of Dismissal without prejudice as to Defendant G&P Enterprises, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/1/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. Resources Group, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cortez Heights Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G&P Enterprises Nevada, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resources Group, LLC,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Wayne O. Klomp
Represented By: Jeffrey L Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?