Zimmerman v. SSB Eastern, LLC
Plaintiff: Kevin Zimmerman
Defendant: SSB Eastern, LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv01200
Filed: April 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting 14 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 1 Complaint (Third Request). SSB Eastern, LLC answer due 7/7/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/16/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting 11 Stipulation to Extend Deadline. SSB Eastern, LLC answer due 6/14/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/8/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) Modified on 6/8/2017 to correct date signed (DKJ).
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting 9 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 1 Complaint (First Request). SSB Eastern, LLC answer due 6/7/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zimmerman v. SSB Eastern, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSB Eastern, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Zimmerman
Represented By: Whitney C Wilcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?