Jensen v. Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Duane Jensen
Defendant: Todd R Fasulo Sr, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department and Lisa Lichtenberger
Case Number: 2:2017cv01219
Filed: May 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting 41 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/22/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/3/2021 at 11:00 AM in LV Chambers - before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. The call-in telephone number is (888) 273-3658, access code: 3912597. The call must be made five minutes prior to the hearing time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/20/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 34 MOTION to Reconvene Settlement Conference re 32 Order. Settlement documents are due by 9/2/2020 and may be delivered to chambers or emailed to VCF_Chambers@nvd.uscourts.gov no later than 4:00PM. Do not deliver a copy on opposing counsel. Settlement Conference set for 9/9/2020 at 10:00 AM in LV Chambers before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/22/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part Defendants' 13 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's 16 Counter Motion for Sanctions is Denied. This matter is referred to the magistrate judge to schedule a mandatory settlement conference with the remaining parties. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: Defendants' Motion for Leave to Supplement 20 is GRANTED. Defendants have until May 16, 2018, to file their proposed supplemental brief and serve it on Jensen. Jensen has until June 4, 2018, to file a response to that supplemental br ief of five pages or less; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Stay 26 is DENIED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to STRIKE 23 Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Reply as an unauthorized document. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/11/2018. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jensen v. Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd R Fasulo Sr
Represented By: Nicholas Crosby
Represented By: Jacqueline V. Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Represented By: Nicholas Crosby
Represented By: Jacqueline V. Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Lichtenberger
Represented By: Nicholas Crosby
Represented By: Jacqueline V. Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?