The Bankof New York Mellon v. United States Department of the Treasury - Internal Revenue Service et al
Plaintiff: Bank of New York Mellon
Defendant: Jonathon Dale Amos, Melissa Amos, NV Mortgage, Inc. and United States Department of the Treasury - Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 2:2017cv01242
Filed: May 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Petition to Quiet Ti
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 17 Stipulated/Consent Judgment; CONSENT JUDGMENT in favor of United States Department of the Treasury - Internal Revenue Service against Bank of New York Mellon. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/31/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 15 Stipulation to Continue Stay; Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 12 Stipulation to Stay Case; Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/9/2018.; Case stayed. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Bankof New York Mellon v. United States Department of the Treasury - Internal Revenue Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathon Dale Amos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Amos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NV Mortgage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Treasury - Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Boris Kukso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Christina H. Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?