Albanese v. Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Plaintiff: Grace Albanese
Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Case Number: 2:2017cv01284
Filed: May 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation ECF No. 8 is accepted and adopted; that this action is dismissed without prejudice; Clerk directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 07/05/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the Court dismiss this case without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 6/29/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/15/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Plaintiff's request to proceed IFP (ECF No. 1 ) is GRANTED. Clerk shall file the Complaint. The Complaint is DISMISSED with leave to amend. Amended complaint due by 6/9/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/10/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Albanese v. Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grace Albanese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?