Novva Ausrustung Group, Inc. v. Kajioka

Plaintiff: Novva Ausrustung Group, Inc.
Defendant: Dean Kajioka
Unknown: Eric D. Herschmann
Case Number: 2:2017cv01293
Filed: May 8, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2017 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 37 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 21, 2017 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 29 Novva's Motion to Strike is GRANTED with respect to Kajioka's Affirmative Defenses Nos. 6, 7, 21-28, and 36. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 29 Novva's Motion to Strike is DENIED with respect to Kajiokas Affirmative Defenses Nos. 4, 5, and 17-20. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/21/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 20, 2017 32 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. IT IS RECOMMENDED that 29 Novva's Motion to Strike be GRANTED with respect to Kajioka's Affirmative Defenses Nos. 6, 7, 21-28, and 36. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that 29 Novva's Motion to Strike be DENIED with respect to Kajioka's Affirmative Defenses Nos. 4, 5, and 17-20. Objections to R&R due by 10/4/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/20/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 13, 2017 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 14 Defendant Dean Kajioka's Motion to Strike is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/13/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 2, 2017 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 7 Stipulation to Extend Deadline. Dean Kajioka answer due 6/15/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/2/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Novva Ausrustung Group, Inc. v. Kajioka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Kajioka
Represented By: Martin J. Kravitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Novva Ausrustung Group, Inc.
Represented By: Michael P Bowen
Represented By: Adam K. Bult
Represented By: Emily Anne Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Eric D. Herschmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?