Branch Banking and Trust Company v. R&S St. Rose Lenders, LLC et al
Appellant: Branch Banking and Trust Company
Appellee: Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company, R&S Investment Group, R&S St. Rose Lenders, LLC and The Creditor Group
In Re: R & S St. Rose, LLC
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Case Number: 2:2017cv01298
Filed: May 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER approving ECF No. 34 Stipulation re ECF No. 19 Opening Brief: Answering brief due by 5/4/2018. Reply brief due by 5/18/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting ECF No. 32 Stipulation : Answering brief due by 5/2/2018. Reply brief due by 5/16/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting ECF No. 30 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief to ECF No. 19 Opening Brief. Answering brief due by 4/27/2018 and Reply brief due by 5/11/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting ECF No. 16 Stipulation to Extend Brief Deadlines : Opening brief due by 3/14/2014. Answering brief due by 4/13/2018. Reply brief due by 4/27/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Branch Banking and Trust Company v. R&S St. Rose Lenders, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Branch Banking and Trust Company
Represented By: Bryce Alstead
Represented By: J. Stephen Peek
Represented By: Joseph G. Went
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Scott E Gizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: R&S Investment Group
Represented By: Ogonna M Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: R&S St. Rose Lenders, LLC
Represented By: Nedda Ghandi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: The Creditor Group
Represented By: Mark Malloy Weisenmiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: R & S St. Rose, LLC
Represented By: Samuel A. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: U.S. Trustee, Las Vegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?