Branch Banking and Trust Company v. R&S St. Rose, LLC et al
Defendant: The Creditor Group
Appellant: Branch Banking & Trust Company
Appellee: R & S St. Rose Lenders, LLC and R & S St. Rose, LLC
Unknown: Laura Deeter
In Re: R & S St. Rose Lenders, LLC
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Case Number: 2:2017cv01322
Filed: May 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER that the Bankruptcy Court's Plan Confirmation Order is affirmed (re Bankruptcy Case No. 11-14973-MKN). Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in accordance with this order and close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/30/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting ECF No. 46 Stipulation for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief to ECF No. 14 Opening Brief. Reply Brief due by 5/18/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting ECF No. 41 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief to ECF No. 14 Opening Brief. Answering brief due by 4/27/2018 and Reply brief due by 5/11/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting ECF No. 38 Stipulation : Answering brief due by 4/13/2018. Reply brief due by 4/27/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying Appellant's ECF No. 2 Emergency Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/2/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Branch Banking and Trust Company v. R&S St. Rose, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Branch Banking & Trust Company
Represented By: Bryce Alstead
Represented By: Joseph S. Kistler
Represented By: J. Stephen Peek
Represented By: Joseph G. Went
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: R & S St. Rose Lenders, LLC
Represented By: Nedda Ghandi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: R & S St. Rose, LLC
Represented By: Bryan A. Lindsey
Represented By: Samuel A. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Laura Deeter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: R & S St. Rose Lenders, LLC
Represented By: Nedda Ghandi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Creditor Group
Represented By: Talitha Gray Kozlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: U.S. Trustee, Las Vegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?