September 10, 2019 |
Filing
344
ORDER Granting in Part 272 the Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Remanding Count One to State Court. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Certified Copy of Order and Docket Sheet sent to State Court - MR)
|
August 13, 2019 |
Filing
339
ORDER Granting in part 218 Motion to Seal and and Overruling 329 Objections. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
May 23, 2019 |
Filing
321
ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 280 , 281 Motions to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/23/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
May 7, 2019 |
Filing
311
ORDER re 310 Motion to Strike. Any response must be filed by 5/13/2019, and any reply must be filed by 5/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
April 30, 2019 |
Filing
308
ORDER denying 303 Motion to Strike; ORDER denying 285 Motion to Strike; ORDER denying 300 Motion to Strike; Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/30/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
April 18, 2019 |
Filing
304
ORDER re 300 , 303 Motions to Strike. Responses due by 4/22/2019. Replies due by 4/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
January 28, 2019 |
Filing
265
ORDER re 251 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees. The Court hereby VACATES the deadline to pay the ordered attorneys' fees pending resolution of the motion to reconsider. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/28/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
January 24, 2019 |
Filing
263
ORDER Granting 260 Motion to Extend Time re 253 , 258 Orders (First Request). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/24/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
January 23, 2019 |
Filing
262
ORDER re: 260 Motion to Extend Certain Deadlines. Any response shall be filed by noon on January 24, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/23/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
January 22, 2019 |
Filing
261
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Ray Liepins, Miles Rodela and Karla Nolan are dismissed as plaintiffs in the Garcia action, Case No. 2:17-cv-01340-APG-NJK. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
January 17, 2019 |
Filing
258
ORDER Denying without prejudice 216 , 224 , 227 Motions to Seal. The Clerk's Office is INSTRUCTED to maintain the subject documents under seal for the time-being pending further motion practice as outlined. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/17/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
January 15, 2019 |
Filing
250
AMENDED ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that counsel shall comply with the requirements of Local Rule IA 10-5, the Ninth Circuit's decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the procedures outlined, with respect to any documents filed under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
December 19, 2018 |
Filing
242
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 240 the plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that by 5:00 p.m. on 1/3/2019, the defendants shall file a response to the plaintiffs' request to expedite trial. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiffs' request to expedite trial is set for hearing on 1/7/2019 at 3:30 p.m. in Las Vegas courtroom 6C. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
December 11, 2018 |
Filing
232
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 206 , 209 the plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 214 the plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration is DENIED. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
November 13, 2018 |
Filing
211
ORDER Granting 210 Motion to Extend Time re 206 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (First Request). Responses due by 11/30/2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
October 3, 2018 |
Filing
188
ORDER re 187 Motion to Extend Time. Any response shall be filed by 10/4/2018, and any reply shall be filed by 10/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
October 1, 2018 |
Filing
186
ORDER re 173 Motion to Seal. The motion to seal is hereby GRANTED in limited part. In particular, the Clerk's Office shall maintain under seal the unredacted exhibit at Docket No. 173 -4. The Clerk's Office shall unseal the declarat ion at Docket No. 173 -10. Lastly the Clerk's Office shall strike the remaining exhibits at issue: Docket Nos. 173 -1, 173 -2, 173 -3, 173 -5, 173 -6, 173 -7, 173 -8, and 173 -9. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
September 21, 2018 |
Filing
183
ORDER that the Clerk's Office is instructed to STRIKE the 173 Motion to Seal. Docket Nos. 173 -1, 173 -2, 173 -3, 173 -4, 173 -5, 173 -6, 173 -7, 173 -8, 173 -9, and 173 -10 remain under seal for the time-being. Plaintiffs sha ll immediately serve Defendants with 173 , the ten exhibits, and shall file a proof of service by 9/24/2018. The Court DEFERS ruling on whether the above exhibits (or portions thereof) warrant secrecy. Supplement due by 9/28/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
September 18, 2018 |
Filing
177
ORDER Granting 135 , 136 , 148 Motions to Seal as amended to cover the proposed redactions. The Clerk's Office shall maintain under seal the unredacted versions of the documents at Docket Nos. 134 -17, 135 -3, 135 -4, 135 -5, 135 -6, 149 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
September 6, 2018 |
Filing
164
ORDER re 135 , 136 , 148 Motions to Seal. IT IS SO ORDERED that the Clerk's Office is INSTRUCTED to unseal the filings at Docket Nos. 135 , 135 -1, and 135 -2. The Court DEFERS ruling on the other aspects of the motions to seal pending the filing of the supplement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
August 2, 2018 |
Filing
146
ORDER Re: 142 Motion for Protective Order. Responses due by 8/7/2018. Replies due by 8/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
July 12, 2018 |
Filing
137
ORDER. The Court will unseal 135 the motion to seal itself and 135 -1 the declaration in support of that motion to seal unless a further motion is filed explaining why they should remain sealed by 3:00 p.m. on 7/13/2018. As a one-time courtesy to the parties, the Court will allow the subject document to be sealed on an interim basis pending resolution of the motion to seal. The Clerk's Office is INSTRUCTED to seal Docket No. 134 -17 ("Exhibit 21"). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
June 27, 2018 |
Filing
132
ORDER. The Court hereby STRIKES the exhibits at Docket No. 125 -1 through 125 -23. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
March 15, 2018 |
Filing
121
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that counsel shall comply with the requirements of Local Rule IA 10-5, the Ninth Circuit's decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the procedures outlined above, with respect to any documents filed under seal. To th e extent any aspect of the stipulated protective order may conflict with this order or Local Rule IA 10-5, that aspect of the stipulated protective order is hereby superseded with this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
January 24, 2018 |
Filing
114
ORDER Granting 113 Stipulation re Discovery. Discovery due by 6/21/2018. Motions due by 7/23/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/23/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
January 9, 2018 |
Filing
112
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 105 the defendants' motion to remove Local 1107 as a plaintiff is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
December 1, 2017 |
Filing
98
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 60 the plaintiffs' motion to amend and 66 the defendants' motion for leave to file a sur-reply are DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 94 the parties' stipulation is GRANTED in that the defendants' response to 92 the plaintiffs' motion to amend is due 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/1/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
October 25, 2017 |
Filing
78
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 40 the defendants' motion to dismiss is GRANTED in part. Count four for fraudulent misrepresentation and the part of count six alleging legal malpractice based on a conflict of interest are dismissed. The Local 1107 is dismissed as a plaintiff. Defendants Luisa Blue, Mary Henry, and Steve Ury are dismissed as defendants. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/25/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
October 24, 2017 |
Filing
75
ORDER Denying 67 Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
July 31, 2017 |
Filing
54
ORDER re 52 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. In that discovery plan, the parties seek an early neutral evaluation. It does not appear that this case qualifies for the Early Neutral Evaluation program. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/31/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
July 12, 2017 |
Filing
49
ORDER granting 43 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.; granting 45 Motion to Extend Time re 40 Motion to Dismiss. Replies due by 7/17/2017. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/12/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
June 19, 2017 |
Filing
37
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 25 the defendants' motion to dismiss is DENIED as moot because it was aimed at the original complaint. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/19/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
June 16, 2017 |
Filing
36
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that I will not address 32 the plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration on an emergency basis. The motion will be briefed and resolved in the ordinary course. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/16/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
May 26, 2017 |
Filing
18
ORDER that 14 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order is DENIED. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/26/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
May 24, 2017 |
Filing
12
ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule for 11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The defendants shall file their opposition, if any, to the motion for preliminary injunction on or before 5:00 p.m. PDT on Tuesday, 5/30/2017. The plaintiff may file a reply in support of the motion on or before 5:00 p.m. PDT on Friday, 6/2/2017. I will conduct a hearing on the motion for preliminary injunction in Las Vegas Courtroom 6C on Wednesday, 6/7/2017 at 09:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
May 23, 2017 |
Filing
9
ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule for 5 Motion to Remand. The defendants shall file their opposition, if any, to the emergency motion on or before 5:00 p.m. PDT on Tuesday, 5/30/2017. The plaintiff may file a reply in support of the motion on or before 5:00 p.m. PDT on Friday, 6/2/2017. I will conduct a hearing on the motion in Las Vegas Courtroom 6C on Wednesday, 6/7/2017 at 09:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/23/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|