U.S. Bank National Association v. Ou et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Defendant: Arlington West Twilight Homeowners Association, Zilian Ou and SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv01354
Filed: May 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition to Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting 79 Stipulation for Extension of time to Respond to 64 Bill of Costs, 65 Motion for Attorney Fees. Objection/Response to Bill of Costs due by 6/26/2020. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/5/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting 77 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Fourth Request) to Respond to 65 Motion for Attorney Fees, 64 Bill of Costs; Responses due by 6/5/2020. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/14/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting 73 Stipulation for extension of time (Second Request) to Respond to: 64 Bill of Costs and 65 Motion for Attorney Fees. Responses due by 5/16/2020. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/16/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting 71 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) to Respond to 64 Bill of Costs and 65 Motion for Attorney Fees. Responses due by 4/16/2020. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/2/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting 66 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Respond 65 Motion for Attorney Fees and 64 Bill of Costs. Responses are now due by 4/2/2020. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/17/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting 51 and 52 Motions to Extend Time to File Notices of Appeal. To the extent the time to appeal ran from the Court's January 9, 2020 order even though a claim remained pending in this action, time is now extended for any party to file a notice of appeal to March 6, 2020. Judgment shall also be entered by the Clerk of Court. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/20/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) Modified on 2/20/2020 (DRS).
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER. I ORDER that 23 defendant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's motion to dismiss is DENIED as moot. I FURTHER ORDER that 36 , 37 defendants SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC and Arlington West Twilight Homeowners Association's motions for su mmary judgment are GRANTED. All of plaintiff U.S. Bank, National Association's claims except its judicial foreclosure claim are DISMISSED as time-barred. I FURTHER ORDER that 35 defendant U.S. Bank National Association's motion for summary judgment is DENIED. I FURTHER ORDER that the proposed joint pretrial order or a status report is due by 2/12/2020. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/9/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Granting 45 Second Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 35 , 36 , and 36 Motions for Summary Judgment. Arlington West Twilight Homeowners Association's Replies due by 11/22/2019. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting 40 First Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 35 , 36 and 37 Motions for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 12/13/2019. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/30/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting 38 First Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion. Deadline: 10/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 10/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 17 Stipulation. SFR's Motion for Demand for Security of Costs is granted. U.S. Bank shall post a cost bond in the amount of $500.00 or make a cash deposit of $500.00 as to SFR within seven (7) days of the entry of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER STAYING CASE. This case is administratively STAYED. Once the proceedings in the United States Supreme Court in Bourne Valley Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank have concluded, any party may move to lift the stay. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/15/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association v. Ou et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arlington West Twilight Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zilian Ou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Represented By: Natalie L Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?