Salvati-Bryant v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Susanne Salvati-Bryant
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2017cv01406
Filed: May 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Susanne Salvati-Bryant and against the Commissioner in the amount of $10,887.25, less any applicable processing fees allowed by statute. Freeman must also refund $4,900 to Salvati-Bryant. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 10/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of plaintiff Susanne Salvati-Bryant against defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, Acting Commissioner, Social Security Administration, in the amount of $5,300, less any applicable processing fees allowed by statute. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 7/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER that 22 Motion for Attorney Fees is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of Salvati-Bryant and against the Commissioner in the amount of $5,300, less any applicable processing fees allowed by statute. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re 18 Stipulation for Voluntary Remand. ORDERED that this matter is REMANDED under sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) for a new hearing and decision. Upon remand, the Office of Disability Adjudication and Review must remand this cas e to an ALJ with instructions to vacate the prior decision, convene another administrative hearing and reconsider whether the plaintiff remained capable of performing her past relevant work or other work that exists in significant numbers within the national economy, and take any further action deemed necessary to develop the record, reassess plaintiff's RFC, and issue the new decision. The pending motion to remand 16 is DENIED as moot. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) Modified on 12/13/2017 to correct typo (MMM).
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 14 Motion for Final Enlargement of the Briefing Schedule. Motions due by 11/20/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/16/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting 10 Motion to Extend Briefing Schedule. Motions due by 11/15/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/13/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salvati-Bryant v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susanne Salvati-Bryant
Represented By: Hal Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?