YWS Architects, LLC v. Alon Las Vegas Resort, LLC et al
Plaintiff: YWS Architects, LLC
Defendant: Alon Las Vegas Landco, LLC, Alon Las Vegas Resort, LLC and Tishmar, LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv01417
Filed: May 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 127 CLERK'S JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 9/23/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting 122 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice; Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting 120 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to Tom Wucherer; Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER Granting 114 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 113 Motion for Attorney Fees. Responses due by 10/25/2018. Replies due by 11/1/2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER denying 31 Motion; ORDER accepting and adopting 83 Report and Recommendation; ORDER denying 86 Motion; ORDER granting nunc pro tunc 94 Stipulation to Extend Time to file Reply; Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting 102 Stipulation; Discovery due by 9/28/2018. Motions due by 10/28/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/27/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting 96 Stipulation; First Amended Complaint due within five (5) days of the entry of this Order. FURTHER ORDERED that YWS Architects, LLC file a First Amended Answer to Alon's Counter-claim within five (5) days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting 87 Stipulation; Re: 83 Report and Recommendation, 86 Motion Response to Objections to R&R due by 3/28/2018. Replies to 83 due by 4/4/2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER accepting and adopting 66 Report and Recommendation; FURTHER ORDERED that the encumbrance evidenced by the Western Alliance Bank UCC Financing Statement be expunged, only as to Tishmar's real property. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/1/2018: # 1 Exhibit) (JM).
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting 75 Stipulation to Extend Hearing re 70 Notice of Surety Bond; Hearing reset for 1/30/2018 at 03:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. FURTHER ORDERED that briefing schedule for 67 Motion is extended. Responses due 7 days after completion of the hearing; Replies due 10 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Approving Amended Joint Prehearing Statement Re: 57 Order, 52 Order Setting Evidentiary Hearing, Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER in preparation for 1/12/2018 hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Granting 53 Stipulation to Extend Time. Evidentiary Hearing reset for 1/12/2018 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER that an Evidentiary Hearing is set for 12/5/2017 at 01:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Joint Prehearing Statement due by 11/28/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/16/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Granting 44 Stipulation to Extend Time re 31 Motion. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 11 Errata to Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. Alon Las Vegas Landco, LLC answer due 7/11/2017; Alon Las Vegas Resort, LLC answer due 7/11/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: YWS Architects, LLC v. Alon Las Vegas Resort, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alon Las Vegas Landco, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alon Las Vegas Resort, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tishmar, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YWS Architects, LLC
Represented By: Shauna L. Norton
Represented By: Mark G Tratos
Represented By: Lisa J Zastrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?