Wegner et al v. Wells Fargo Bank National Association et al

Plaintiff: Ronille Russell and Jacqueline Wegner
Defendant: Claudia Russ Anderson, Pamela Conboy, Matthew Raphaelson, James M. Strother, John Stumpf, Carrie Tolstedt and Wells Fargo Bank National Association
Case Number: 2:2017cv01429
Filed: May 19, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 25, 2018 102 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER Re: 98 Order on Stipulation. Michael Proctor, now of Durie Tangri LLP is substituted in the place of Boies Schiller Flexner LLP including attorneys Jeffrey Hammer, Andrew Esbenshade, and FeiFei Jiang. Amanda Yen of McDonald Carano is substituted in the place of Richard Pocker of Boies Schiller Flexner LLP as local counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 12, 2018 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 96 and 97 Stipulations re Substitutions of Attorneys. Michael Proctor, now of Durie Tangri LLP is substituted in the place of Boies Schiller Flexner LLP including attorneys Jeffrey Hammer, Andrew Esbenshade, and FeiFei Jiang. Local counsel shall remain the same with both Richard Pocker of Boies Schiller Flexner LLP and Amanda Yen of McDonald Carano. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 8, 2018 93 Opinion or Order of the Court STRICKEN per 95 Order (EDS) ORDER that the following discovery plan and scheduling order dates shall apply: Discovery due by 4/16/2018. Motions due by 5/16/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wegner et al v. Wells Fargo Bank National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claudia Russ Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Conboy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Raphaelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M. Strother
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Stumpf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrie Tolstedt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronille Russell
Represented By: Shelley D. Krohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Wegner
Represented By: Mark Ramsey Heilbrun
Represented By: Shelley D. Krohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?