Zimmerman v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Plaintiff: Kevin Zimmerman
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv01454
Filed: May 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER that Magistrate Judge Foley's 11 Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED in its entirety. The instant case is DISMISSED without prejudice. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/16/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Denying Defendant-Intervenor's 12 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that this case be dismissed without prejudice for Plaintiff's failure to prosecute. Objections to R&R due by 10/26/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/12/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zimmerman v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Zimmerman
Represented By: Whitney C Wilcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?