Bank of New York Mellon v. Painted Desert Community Association, et al

Plaintiff: Bank of New York Mellon
Defendant: Eva Berou, Ron Haus, Nevada Association Services, Inc. and Painted Desert Community Association
Case Number: 2:2017cv01466
Filed: May 22, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order 68 AMENDED ORDER Re: 66 Order on Motion to Strike. Motion for Reconsideration 50 is granted. Order 41 is Vacated. Berou and Haus' 41 Motion to Strike is denied as moot. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order 66 ORDER Granting 50 BANA's Motion for Reconsideration. FURTHER ORDERED that 41 the court's order filed July 23, 2018 is VACATED. FURTHER ORDERED that 49 Motion to Strike Jury Demand is DENIED as moot. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order 57 ORDER granting 55 Stipulation to Extend Time to Reply re: 50 Motion to Alter or Amend. Replies due by 10/31/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order 56 ORDER that 54 Motion to Extend the Deadline to Serve Confidential Settlement Statement is GRANTED as a one-time courtesy to Defendants and their counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order 38 ORDER Granting 37 Stipulation to Extend Time to Reply re: 34 Motion for Summary Judgment. Replies due by 2/23/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order 33 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 32 Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 12/20/2017. NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS WILL BE GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/7/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order 16 ORDER OF RECUSAL. This action is referred to the Clerk of Court for reassignment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/10/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of New York Mellon v. Painted Desert Community Association, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Tenesa S Scaturro
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eva Berou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Haus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Association Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Painted Desert Community Association
Represented By: Kurt R. Bonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?