Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. Mahogany Meadows Avenue Trust et al
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Copper Creek Homeowners Association, Hampton & Hampton Collections, LLC and Mahogany Meadows Avenue Trust
Case Number: 2:2017cv01469
Filed: May 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDERED: That the courts prior order, 30 Order on Motion to Dismiss, be, and the same hereby is, CORRECTED nunc pro tunc to instruct the clerk to enter judgment and close the case accordingly. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/15/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER that Defendant Mahogany's 9 Motion to Dismiss Wells Fargo's complaint is GRANTED without prejudice as to Wells Fargo's claims for quiet title and unjust enrichment claim. The HOA's 13 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED without prejudice as to Wells Fargo's violation of NRS 116.1113 and wrongful foreclosure claims. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting 24 Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 4/11/2018. Motions due by 5/8/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/8/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Re: 24 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/13/2017. Responses due by 11/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting 18 Stipulation of Dismissal without prejudice as to Copper CreekHomeowners Association. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/2/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting 15 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) re 13 First MOTION to Dismiss. Plaintiff's Responses due by 8/2/2017. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting 11 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) re 9 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 7/26/2017. Replies due by 8/2/2017. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. Mahogany Meadows Avenue Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Copper Creek Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hampton & Hampton Collections, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mahogany Meadows Avenue Trust
Represented By: Michael F. Bohn
Represented By: Adam R Trippiedi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Kelly H Dove
Represented By: Michael Paretti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?