Bortolamedi v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Jacquelynn Bortolamedi
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2017cv01473
Filed: May 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 25 the magistrate judge's report and recommendation is ADOPTED in full. IS FURTHER ORDERED that 13 the motion for judgment on the pleadings is GRANTED in part and DENIED in PART, consistent with 25 the rep ort and recommendation, and 18 the Commissioner's cross-motion to affirm is DENIED. This case is REMANDED for further proceedings regarding Drs. Hodde, Austin, and Madow's opinions and the vocational expert's testimony. The Clerk of Court is directed to ENTER JUDGMENT accordingly and CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/17/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting 16 Motion to Extend Time. Motions due by 1/29/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting 14 Motion to Extend Time. Motions due by 12/28/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bortolamedi v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacquelynn Bortolamedi
Represented By: Daniel S. Jones
Represented By: Hal Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?