Bear Omnimedia LLC v. Mania Media LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Bear Omnimedia LLC |
Defendant: |
Bear World Media Ltd, CM Publications Limited, Domains By Proxy LLC, Mania Media LLC, PayPal, Inc. and Steven Tilotta |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv01478 |
Filed: |
May 24, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Miranda M. Du |
Presiding Judge: |
Carl W. Hoffman |
Nature of Suit: |
Trademark |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 44 Trademark Infringement |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 1, 2019 |
Filing
132
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE granting 131 Stipulation. (The remaining defendants other than Mania Media LLC that have appeared all have been terminated.) Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/1/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
January 24, 2019 |
Filing
130
ORDER granting ECF No. 129 Motion to Remove Counsel from Electronic Service List. Kurt R. Bonds, Esq. and Adam R. Knecht of Alverson Taylor & Sanders removed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/24/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
|
October 17, 2018 |
Filing
121
ORDER that Mania's Motion to Dismiss ECF No. 116 is granted in part and denied in part; Plaintiff's trademark dilution and common law injury to business reputation claims are dismissed with leave to amend; plaintiff to file fourth amended complaint by 11/1/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
|
May 22, 2018 |
Filing
110
ORDERED that Mania's Anti-SLAPP Motion (ECF No. 97 ) is denied. It is further ordered that Instagram's 12(b)(6) Motion (ECF No. 100 ) is granted. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
February 7, 2018 |
Filing
105
ORDER granting ECF No. 104 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant Webid Consulting, LTD. All claims against Defendant Webid Consulting, LTD., DBA Bearworld.com and Bear411.com are dismissed with prejudice; each party shall bear their own attorney's fees and costs. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
January 11, 2018 |
Filing
91
ORDER granting ECF No. 90 Second Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to ECF No. 58 Third Amended Complaint. Defendant Mania Media LLC's answer/response due by 1/17/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
January 4, 2018 |
Filing
84
ORDER granting ECF No. 83 Motion to Extend Time : Mania Media LLC's answer to ECF No. 58 Third Amended Complaint due by 1/10/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
December 14, 2017 |
Filing
80
ORDER granting ECF No. 78 Stipulation to Extend Time to File a response to ECF No. 58 Third Amended Complaint. Instagram LLC response/answer due 1/31/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?