Collier v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Drake Collier
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Trans Union, LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv01486
Filed: May 25, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Granting 45 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Case terminated. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER re 41 Notice of Settlement. The settling parties shall have until December 26, 2017, to either file a stipulation to dismiss with prejudice, or a joint status report advising when the stipulation to dismiss will be filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/26/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER that plaintiff's pending motions 22 , 23 , 24 , and 29 are GRANTED. The clerk of court shall maintain 23 under seal. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/20/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re 20 Notice of Settlement. ORDERED that the settling parties shall have until October 20, 2017, to either file a stipulation to dismiss, or a joint status report advising when the stipulation will be filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/22/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting 18 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Amend Pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/7/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 14 Stipulation re: Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collier v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drake Collier
Represented By: Miles N Clark
Represented By: Matthew I Knepper
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer L Braster
Represented By: Andrew J Sharples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Jason Revzin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?