U.S. Bank National Association v. Dorrell Trust Pender NV West, et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Defendant: Dorrell Trust Pender NV West, G&P Enterprises, LLC and Spinnaker Homes at Centennial Hills Homeowners Association
Case Number: 2:2017cv01493
Filed: May 25, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331(a) Fed. Question: Real Property
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Granting 65 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 59 Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 9/13/2019. Replies due by 9/27/2019. Hearing date remains unchanged. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/8/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER. Based on the parties' stipulation 63 and good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the opposition deadline is extended to August 23, 2019, the reply deadline is extended to September 6, 2019, and the hearing on the motion for s ummary judgment 59 scheduled for August 26, 2019, is VACATED and RESET to October 7, 2019, at 3:30 p.m. in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Granting 54 Stipulation to Lift Stay. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties file a new discovery plan and scheduling order with this court no later than 21 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that THIS CASE IS STAYED for all purposes. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 25 , 32 the motions to dismiss are DENIED without prejudice to their refiling once the stay is lifted, and 34 , 48 the motions for leave to file excess pages are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Granting 46 Stipulation to Amend Caption. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/16/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Granting 42 Stipulation to Extend Time re 32 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively, MOTION for Summary Judgment. ( Responses due by 10/17/2017., Replies due by 10/24/2017.) Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/10/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting 37 Stipulation to Extend Time re 32 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively, MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Responses due by 10/10/2017., Replies due by 10/24/2017.) Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/19/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting 30 Stipulation to Extend Time re 25 MOTION to Dismiss re 1 Complaint. (Responses due by 9/13/2017., Replies due by 9/20/2017.) Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association v. Dorrell Trust Pender NV West, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorrell Trust Pender NV West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G&P Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spinnaker Homes at Centennial Hills Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Alexandria LaVonne Layton
Represented By: Jeffrey L Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?