U.S. Bank National Association v. Dorrell Trust Pender NV West, et al
Plaintiff: |
U.S. Bank National Association |
Defendant: |
Dorrell Trust Pender NV West, G&P Enterprises, LLC and Spinnaker Homes at Centennial Hills Homeowners Association |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv01493 |
Filed: |
May 25, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Jennifer A. Dorsey |
Presiding Judge: |
Carl W. Hoffman |
Nature of Suit: |
Constitutional - State Statute |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1331 (a) Fed. Question: Real Property |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 8, 2019 |
Filing
69
ORDER Granting 65 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 59 Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 9/13/2019. Replies due by 9/27/2019. Hearing date remains unchanged. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/8/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
July 9, 2019 |
Filing
64
ORDER. Based on the parties' stipulation 63 and good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the opposition deadline is extended to August 23, 2019, the reply deadline is extended to September 6, 2019, and the hearing on the motion for s ummary judgment 59 scheduled for August 26, 2019, is VACATED and RESET to October 7, 2019, at 3:30 p.m. in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
|
January 4, 2019 |
Filing
55
ORDER Granting 54 Stipulation to Lift Stay. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties file a new discovery plan and scheduling order with this court no later than 21 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
November 14, 2017 |
Filing
53
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that THIS CASE IS STAYED for all purposes. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 25 , 32 the motions to dismiss are DENIED without prejudice to their refiling once the stay is lifted, and 34 , 48 the motions for leave to file excess pages are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
October 16, 2017 |
Filing
47
ORDER Granting 46 Stipulation to Amend Caption. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/16/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
October 10, 2017 |
Filing
43
ORDER Granting 42 Stipulation to Extend Time re 32 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively, MOTION for Summary Judgment. ( Responses due by 10/17/2017., Replies due by 10/24/2017.) Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/10/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
September 19, 2017 |
Filing
38
ORDER Granting 37 Stipulation to Extend Time re 32 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively, MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Responses due by 10/10/2017., Replies due by 10/24/2017.) Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/19/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
September 5, 2017 |
Filing
31
ORDER Granting 30 Stipulation to Extend Time re 25 MOTION to Dismiss re 1 Complaint. (Responses due by 9/13/2017., Replies due by 9/20/2017.) Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?