HSBC Bank USA, National Association v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al
Plaintiff: HSBC Bank USA, National Association
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC, SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC and Southern Highlands Community Association
Case Number: 2:2017cv01497
Filed: May 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 SECOND AMENDED ORDER Re: 52 Order on Motion to Dismiss. Ordered that The $500 deposit be refunded in accordance with the certificate of cash deposit, ECF No. 19, to: HSBC Bank USA. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/23/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: Finance - JM)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 AMENDED ORDER Re: 52 Order on Motion to Dismiss. Ordered that The $500 deposit be refunded in accordance with the certificate ot cash deposit, ECF No. 19, to: HSBC Bank USA. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: Finance - JM)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting 49 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond re: 37 Motion for Judgment. Responses due by 11/6/2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 43 Stipulation; Re: 37 Renewed Motion. Responses due 10/23/2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 39 Stipulation; Re: 35 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 9/20/2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting 36 Stipulation; Re: 35 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 9/13/2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 32 Stipulation; Re: 26 Motion for Judgment Responses due by 5/17/2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 28 Stipulation; Re: 26 Motion for Judgment. Responses due by 5/3/2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 21 Stipulation; Re: 20 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 12/18/2017. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/12/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 9 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs. SFR demands that the Bank post a $500 cost bond within thirty (30) days and that the proceedings be stayed until such cost bond is posted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/31/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: Finance - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HSBC Bank USA, National Association v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Represented By: Diana Cline Ebron
Represented By: Jacqueline A. Gilbert
Represented By: Karen L. Hanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Highlands Community Association
Represented By: Kurt R. Bonds
Represented By: David J. Rothenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HSBC Bank USA, National Association
Represented By: Kelly H Dove
Represented By: Michael Paretti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?