Veater v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Nicole Veater
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2017cv01505
Filed: May 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 25 Judge Ferenbach's R&R be, and the same hereby is, ADOPTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 18 plaintiff's motion to remand be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERE D that 21 the Acting Commissioner's motion to affirm be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. The clerk is instructed to enter judgment and close the case accordingly. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/2/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting 15 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request). See Order for deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re 5 Amended Complaint. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall issue summons to the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada and deliver the summons and Amended Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service.The Clerk of th e Court shall also issue summons to the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration and Attorney General of the United States. Plaintiff shall serve the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration by sending a copy of the summons and Amended Complaint by certified mail. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/27/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Veater v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Veater
Represented By: Cyrus Safa
Represented By: Gerald Welt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?