Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. Lee Family Properties, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC, LP Homeowners Association and Lee Family Properties, LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv01513
Filed: May 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331(a) Fed. Question: Real Property
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDERED that the foregoing Stipulation and Order (ECF No. 77 ) to Dismiss Litigation With Prejudice and For Judgment that Deed of Trust Survived HOA Sale by and among the Parties is approved. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/11/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDERED that the status hearing scheduled for 10:00 AM, June 18, 2018, is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting ECF No. 29 Motion to Stay Discovery; parties MUST file a new proposed discovery plan/scheduling order within (20) days after the court decides of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment ECF No. 28 ; status hearing set for 6/18/2018 at 10:00 A.M. in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW) Modified on 12/18/2017 correct typo (KW).
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting ECF No. 36 Amended Stipulation to Extend Time to respond to ECF No. 28 Motion for Summary Judgment. Response due by 12/19/2017. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/11/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER that the Deutsche Bank has up to and including 12/13/2017 to respond to the Lee's Family Properties' Motion to Stay ECF No. 31 . The reply in support of the motion to stay is due by 12/20/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/6/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting ECF No. 33 Stipulation for Extension of Time to respond to ECF Nos. 28 Motion for Summary Judgment and 31 Motion to Stay Case. Lee Family Properties response to ECF No. 28 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is due 12/9/17. Deutsche Bank response to ECF No. 31 Motion to Stay Case is due 12/13/17. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/4/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that the Clerk is directed to serve a copy of this certification order on the Nevada Attorney General (mailed 06/06/2017). Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 06/06/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. Lee Family Properties, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LP Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Family Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Alexandria LaVonne Layton
Represented By: Jeffrey L Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?