Gryglak v. HSBC Bank USA, N.A., et al
Plaintiff: Edyta Gryglak
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, N.A., Wells Fargo Asset Securities Corporation and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2017cv01514
Filed: May 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER granting 143 Stipulation to Extend Deadlines Re: 136 Motion; Responses due by 4/28/2021. Replies due by 5/12/2021. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/16/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER granting 141 Stipulation to Extend deadlines to 136 Motion to Reopen Dispositive Motions Deadline; Responses due by 4/14/2021. Replies due by 4/28/2021. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/2/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting 139 Stipulation to Extend Deadllines Re: 136 Motion. Responses due by 3/31/2021. Replies due by 4/14/2021. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/19/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting 137 Stipulation to Extend time Re: 136 Motion to Reopen Dispositive Motion Deadline. Responses due by 3/17/2021. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/12/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER Denying 130 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/10/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting 133 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to File 132 Reply 130 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/1/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER Clarifying 127 Order and 128 Partial Judgment. The entire bond amount of $159,129.04, plus any accrued interest, which was executed in defendants' favor by this court's order, (ECF No. 127), be disbursed to defendants' counsel. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/10/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; cc: Finance - DRS)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDERED that HSBC Bank USA, N.A.,as trustee for Wells Fargo Home Equity Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2006-3, by its Attorney in- fact Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; and Wells Fargo Asset Securities Corporations 111 motion to execute on bond is GRANTED.Plaintiffs 115 motion for partial summary judgment on defendants claim for wrongful injunction, and plaintiff's 113 & 116 Motions for release of bond obligation, (ECF Nos. 113 & 116), are DENIED as moot.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the entire 100 bond amount of $159,129.04, plus any accrued interest, be executed in defendants favor. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/6/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; cc: Finance- DRS)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting 120 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Boris Avramski from Marathon Law Group, PLLC in for Attorney Boris Avramski from vegas west attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/18/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER Denying Defendants' 45 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's 74 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is Denied and Defendants' 64 Motion to Strike is Denied as moot. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) (Main Document 86 replaced on 7/12/2019) (SLD). Modified to correct ruling re 45 Motion on 7/12/2019 (SLD).
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER Granting 83 Stipulation extending time Re: 74 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Replies due by 4/30/2019. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/30/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER Granting 81 Second Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 74 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Replies due by 4/29/2019. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Granting 79 First Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 74 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiff's Replies due by 4/25/2019. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/19/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Granting 75 First Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 74 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Responses due by 4/11/2019. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Granting 68 First Stipulation Re: 64 Motion to Strike. Replies due by 2/15/2019. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Denying 61 Second Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 45 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants' Replies due by 1/4/2019. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Granting 54 Fourth Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 45 Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 11/13/2018. Replies due by 12/4/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Granting 52 Third Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 45 Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 11/8/2018. Replies due by 11/29/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting 50 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond/Reply re: 45 Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 10/25/2018. Replies due by 11/15/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Granting 48 Stipulation Extending Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule. Plaintiff's Response to 45 Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/18/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Granting 39 First Stipulation re Deposition and Extending Deadline for Dispositive Motion and Pretrial Order. The deposition of plaintiff Edyta Gryglak is permitted to proceed on 8/17/2018. Motions due by 9/13/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/16/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting 32 Third Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 7/13/2018. Motions due by 8/13/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/12/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting 30 First Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 29 Motion for Reconsideration. Defendants' Responses due by 4/16/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting 26 Second Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 5/14/2018. Motions due by 6/15/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/16/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting 15 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) re 10 MOTION to Dismiss. Defendants' Replies due by 9/25/2017. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting 12 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) re 10 MOTION to Dismiss. Plaintiff's Responses due by 9/11/2017. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting 8 Stipulation to Extend Time. Defendants answer due 8/14/2017. NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS WILL BE GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/27/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gryglak v. HSBC Bank USA, N.A., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edyta Gryglak
Represented By: Boris A Avramski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Blakeley E. Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Asset Securities Corporation
Represented By: Blakeley E. Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Blakeley E. Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?