Hunt v. City of Boulder City et al
Plaintiff: John Hunt
Defendant: Boulder City Police Department, City of Boulder City and John Glenn
Case Number: 2:2017cv01519
Filed: May 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Granting 32 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) Re: 29 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's Responses due by 3/23/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Denying without prejudice 21 Stipulation for Extension of Time re Discovery Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/12/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting 11 Stipulation to Dismiss Boulder City Police Department With Prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying 9 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/10/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunt v. City of Boulder City et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boulder City Police Department
Represented By: Craig R. Anderson
Represented By: Jonathan B. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Boulder City
Represented By: Craig R. Anderson
Represented By: Jonathan B. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Glenn
Represented By: Craig R. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hunt
Represented By: David T. Blake
Represented By: Jared R. Richards
Represented By: Stephen P. Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?