Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC |
Defendant: |
Liberty At Mayfield Community Association and SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv01530 |
Filed: |
May 31, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Jennifer A. Dorsey |
Presiding Judge: |
Peggy A. Leen |
Nature of Suit: |
Real Property: Foreclosure |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Petition to Quiet Title |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 28, 2019 |
Filing
50
ORDER: Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment 40 is GRANTED in part. Summary judgment is entered in favor of Carrington on both parties' equitable quiet-title claims, and all other claims are dismissed as moot or noncognizable. The Clerk of Court is directed to ENTER FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC that states: IT IS HEREBY DECLARED that the November 13, 2013, foreclosure sale of the property located at 4245 Creek Bed Ct., Las Vegas, Nevada 89129-6083, as reflected in the Trustees Deed Upon Sale recorded in the Clark County Records as Instrument #201311180000217, resulted in a void sale as to the superpriority portion of the HOA's lien. Accordingly, the deed of trust remained on the property after foreclosure, and SFR purchased the property subject to the deed of trust recorded May 29, 2009, in the Clark County Records as Instrument #20090529-0005970. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is instructed to ENTER JUDGMENT ACCORDINGLY and CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/28/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
|
September 21, 2018 |
Filing
49
ORDERED that the Motions (ECF Nos. 41 & 42 ) are DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
December 11, 2017 |
Filing
28
ORDER. Based on 27 the parties' stipulation and good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all claims against Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. in its capacity as nominee for Ownit Mortgage Solutions, Inc. are DISMISSED with prejudice, each party to bear its own fees and costs. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/11/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
October 24, 2017 |
Filing
25
ORDER Granting 24 Stipulation Dismissing Cassandra J. Lemons Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
July 11, 2017 |
Filing
9
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 7 SFR's Demand for Security of Costs is GRANTED; the CLERK OF COURT is directed to accept the deposit of $500.00 from plaintiff under NRS 18.130 as security for costs and charges that may be awarded aga inst this plaintiff in the event that the cost bond is presented for deposit. Plaintiff must bring a copy of this order to the Clerk's office when making this deposit. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is STAYED by operation of NRS 18.130(1) until the $500 is deposited. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/11/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?