Farmer v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Plaintiff: Doreen Farmer
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv01531
Filed: May 31, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting 40 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Case terminated. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 21 Stipulation re Discovery. Discovery due by 11/26/2018. Motions due by 12/24/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/23/2019. FURTHER ORDERED that no further extensions will be allowed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting 15 Stipulation re Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 5/28/2018. Motions due by 6/27/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/26/2018. FURTHER ORDERED that no further extensions will be allowed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/4/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 11 Stipulation for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/7/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farmer v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer L Braster
Represented By: Andrew J Sharples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doreen Farmer
Represented By: Miles N Clark
Represented By: Matthew I Knepper
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?