Unum Life Insurance Company of America v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Judy Clark and Carolyn Smith
Case Number: 2:2017cv01545
Filed: June 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting 20 Stipulation re 18 Order. Scheduling Conference reset for 11/14/2017 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/11/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting 17 Stipulation re 13 Order. Scheduling Conference reset for 10/11/2017 at 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/11/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 14 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically at the 9/11/2017 Scheduling Conference. The call-in telephone number is (888) 273-3658, access code: 3912597. The call must be made five minutes prior to hearing time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/7/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a scheduling conference is scheduled for 1:00 PM, 9/11/2017, in Courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Unum Life Insurance Company of America v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Smith
Represented By: Thomas Stafford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Anna M Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?