Pagel v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Roxanne J Pagel
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2017cv01547
Filed: June 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 23 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice; Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 21 Stipulation; Motion for Reversal/Remand due by 12/1/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER that Defendant shall submit an electronic courtesy copy of the administrative record, under seal, to CM/ECF within seven (7) days of the filing of this Order (See Order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/18/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that the clerk shall serve the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration by certified mail and shall issue summons to the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada and deliver the summons and Amended Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/7/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that Plaintiff shall file, no later than July 7, 2017, a declaration under penalty of perjury stating her city and state of legal residence. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Completed Application for Fee Waiver due 6/29/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/15/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pagel v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxanne J Pagel
Represented By: Cyrus Safa
Represented By: Gerald Welt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?