Atari Casino, LLC et al v. Skillco LLC
Plaintiff: |
Atari Casino, LLC and Atari Interactive, Inc. |
Defendant: |
Skillco LLC |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv01552 |
Filed: |
June 2, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Jennifer A. Dorsey |
Presiding Judge: |
Nancy J. Koppe |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 29, 2018 |
Filing
64
ORDER denying as moot 54 Motion for Reconsideration; ORDER granting 63 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice; Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
January 18, 2018 |
Filing
62
ORDER granting 61 Stipulation; Re: 54 Motion for Reconsideration Responses due by 2/2/2018. Replies due by 2/7/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
January 3, 2018 |
Filing
60
ORDER that 59 Stipulation is GRANTED as it pertains to the briefing schedule. The Court will determine whether a hearing is necessary once the motion to reconsider has been fully briefed and, if so, will set a hearing. The Court therefore DENIES the parties' request to set a hearing on the motion to reconsider at this time. Mr. Works is still subject to the Court's order to preserve all documents responsive to Plaintiffs' subpoena. Docket No. 56 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
December 28, 2017 |
Filing
58
ORDER denying 57 Stipulation; Any Renewed Stipulation due by 1/2/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
December 27, 2017 |
Filing
56
ORDER granting in part 55 Motion for emergency determination; The Court VACATES Mr. Works' deadline to comply with the Court's prior order, pending decision on Mr. Works' motion to reconsider. Mr. Works is ORDERED to preserve all documents responsive to Plaintiffs' subpoena. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
December 19, 2017 |
Filing
53
ORDER granting 52 Motion to Compel; Plaintiffs shall serve Mr. Works with a copy of this order no later than December 22, 2017. Mr. Works shall comply fully with Plaintiffs' subpoena, no later than December 29, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
August 1, 2017 |
Filing
19
ORDER denying as moot 14 Motion to Dismiss.; granting 18 Stipulation to file Amended Complaint.; Amended Complaint deadline: 8/28/2017. The 15 hearing is Vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/1/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?