JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. v. G2 Ventures LLC et al
Plaintiff: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Arbuckle Drive Homeowners Association, Inc., G2 Ventures LLC, Leonard D. Purcell and Ms. Patricia K. Purcell
Case Number: 2:2017cv01576
Filed: June 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Discharging and Releasing Security Costs. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Finance - ADR)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER re: 63 Joint Status Report. The Court ORDERS the parties to file a stipulation of dismissal no later than September 20, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Granting 58 Motion to Substitute Attorney. James W Pengilly is substituted in place and stead of Timothy P. Elson for Arbuckle Drive Homeowners Association, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Granting 56 Stipulation re Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 2/27/2018. Motions due by 3/28/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER that 53 Stipulation re Discovery Deadlines is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, and deadlines are EXTENDED as follows: Discovery due by 1/28/2018. Motions due by 2/26/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/27/2018. NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS WILL BE GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER that 51 Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadlines is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/1/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER that 49 Stipulation to Stay Discovery is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER. The parties are hereby ORDERED to file, no later than August 23, 2017, either (1) a joint proposed discovery plan; or (2) a status report explaining why a proposed discovery plan should not be filed at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/18/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER that 14 Motion for Cost Bond is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall post security for costs within 7 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting 12 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) re 10 MOTION to Dismiss re 1 Complaint. Plaintiff's Responses due by 7/26/2017. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/1/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. v. G2 Ventures LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arbuckle Drive Homeowners Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G2 Ventures LLC
Represented By: John Henry Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard D. Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Patricia K. Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Justin A Shiroff
Represented By: Abran E. Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?