Nationstar Mortgage LLC v. Sunrise Ridge Master Homeowners Association et al
Plaintiff: |
Nationstar Mortgage LLC |
Defendant: |
4039 Meadow Foxtail Dr. Trust, Nevada Association Services, Inc., Saticoy Bay LLC, Series 4039 Meadow Foxtail Dr. and Sunrise Ridge Master Homeowners Association |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv01586 |
Filed: |
June 7, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Nancy J. Koppe |
Presiding Judge: |
Richard F. Boulware |
Nature of Suit: |
Real Property: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 7, 2020 |
Filing
91
ORDER Granting 90 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/7/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) Modified on 4/7/2020 (JQC).
|
January 16, 2019 |
Filing
74
ORDER granting 73 Motion to Remove Attorney Vatana Lay from Electronic Service List Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/16/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
December 6, 2018 |
Filing
70
ORDER granting 67 Stipulation to Extend Time to Reply re: 55 Motion for Summary Judgment. Replies due by 12/19/2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
November 15, 2018 |
Filing
65
ORDER granting 64 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond re: 55 Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 11/21/2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
September 23, 2018 |
Filing
54
ORDER Granting 53 Stipulation to CONTINUE Date to File Motions and Pretrial Order. Motions due by 10/8/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/8/2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
March 23, 2018 |
Filing
50
ORDER that this case is hereby STAYED. FURTHER ORDERED that 12 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED without prejudice; that 14 Motion to Dismiss or Alternatively, Motion to Consolidate and 42 Motion for Summary Judgment are DENIED without prejudic e; that 40 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED without prejudice; that 41 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED without prejudice.The moving party shall have 21 days from the date of the Nevada Supreme Court's decision on the certif ied question to file a modified Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Summary Judgment or to file a notice renewing the previously filed motion. The opposing party shall have 21 days to respond. The moving party shall have 14 days to reply. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) Modified on 3/23/2018 to reflect correct signing date (MMM).
|
December 14, 2017 |
Filing
39
ORDER that counsel shall comply with the requirements of Local Rule IA 10-5, the Ninth Circuit's decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the procedures outlined above, with respect to any documents filed under seal. To the extent any aspect of the stipulated protective order may conflict with this order or Local Rule IA 10-5, that aspect of the stipulated protective order is hereby superseded with this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
September 12, 2017 |
Filing
31
ORDER that 26 Motion to Stay Discovery is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?