Federal National Mortgage Association v. Keynote Properties, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association
Defendant: Keynote Properties, LLC and Mission Hills Homeowners Association
Case Number: 2:2017cv01647
Filed: June 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting 49 Stipulation re Bill of Costs; Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 31 Motion for Summary Judgment. Keynote's 37 Opposition and Counter Motion is Denied. Keynote's 33 Motion to Extend Time to File a Response is Denied as moot. The clerk is instructed to enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion; Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is due 14 days after the date of this order; any response to the motion is due 28 days after the filing of the motion; any reply in support of the motion will be due 21 days after the date of the filing of the response. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 11 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall post security in the amount of $500.00 within thirty (30) days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/12/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: Finance - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal National Mortgage Association v. Keynote Properties, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Christina Miller
Represented By: Dana Jonathon Nitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keynote Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mission Hills Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?