Williams v. VW Credit et al

Plaintiff: Dorothy J. Williams
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC and VW Credit
Case Number: 2:2017cv01658
Filed: June 14, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 17, 2017 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 8 Stipulation to Extend Time. VW Credit answer due 9/15/2017. NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS WILL BE GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 18, 2017 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 6 Stipulation to Extend Time. Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 8/16/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/18/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 13, 2017 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 4 Stipulation. VW Credit answer due 8/16/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. VW Credit et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VW Credit
Represented By: Stacy H. Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy J. Williams
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?