Albanese v. Homeland Security

Plaintiff: Grace Albanese
Defendant: Homeland Security
Case Number: 2:2017cv01663
Filed: June 14, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 7, 2017 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that 6 Magistrate Judge Koppe's report and recommendation be, and the same hereby is, adopted in its entirety. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the instant case be, and the same hereby is, DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/7/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 27, 2017 6 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The undersigned RECOMMENDS that this case be DISMISSED. Objections to R&R due by 7/11/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/27/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 22, 2017 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall not be required to pay the filing fee of $400.00. The Clerk of the Court shall file the Complaint. The Complaint is DISMISSED with leave to amend. Plaintiff will have until 7/20/2017 to file an Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Albanese v. Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grace Albanese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?