Farmer v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Doreen Farmer
Defendant: Chase Mtg., Equifax Information Services, LLC, First Tennessee Bank, Target National Bank, Trans Union LLC, Wells Fargo Bank NA and Wells Fargo Financial Cards
Case Number: 2:2017cv01680
Filed: June 15, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 7, 2018 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting ECF No. 68 Stipulation Dismissing Action with Prejudice as to Wells Fargo Bank Only. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
March 12, 2018 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting ECF No. 66 Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice as to defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC only. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
February 28, 2018 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting ECF No. 64 Stipulation of Dismissal of Target National Bank With Prejudice. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
December 20, 2017 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting ECF No. 53 Stipulation of Dismissal of First Tennessee Bank with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farmer v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Mtg.
Represented By: Kent F Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Tennessee Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target National Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Jason Revzin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Represented By: Kelly H Dove
Represented By: Tanya N. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Financial Cards
Represented By: Kelly H Dove
Represented By: Tanya N. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doreen Farmer
Represented By: Miles N Clark
Represented By: Matthew I Knepper
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?