Calarco v. Sunrise Hospital & Medical Center

Plaintiff: Nancy Calarco
Defendant: Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center, LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv01682
Filed: June 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 33 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice; Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting 31 Stipulation; Re: 28 Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 8/14/2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting 29 First Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 28 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's Responses due by 7/24/2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 26 Stipulation; Motions due by 6/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 23 Stipulation; Discovery due by 4/30/2018. Motions due by 5/29/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/19/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calarco v. Sunrise Hospital & Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Calarco
Represented By: Andrew L Rempfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?