Garcia v. Specialized Loan Servicing LLC et al
Plaintiff: Troy A. Garcia
Defendant: American Honda Finance Corp., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, Toyota Financial Services and Wells Fargo Card Services
Case Number: 2:2017cv01721
Filed: June 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 68 Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration is GRANTED. The Court GRANTS Defendant's 35 Motion for Summary Judgment in full for the reasons discussed in this order. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/20/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Granting 91 Motion to Remove Attorneys from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER Granting 89 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/3/2020. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/8/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Granting 87 Stipulation to Continue. IT IS ORDERED that the Joint Pretrial Order must be filed on or before 11/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) Modified on 10/3/2019 to correct date signed by Judge (DKJ).
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER Granting 83 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/23/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/1/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Granting 79 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 68 Motion for Reconsideration. Replies due by 5/20/2019. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Granting 76 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 68 Motion for Reconsideration. Responses due by 5/7/2019. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/3/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER denying in part and granting in part 35 Motion for Summary Judgment; and denying 37 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties are directed to submit a Joint Pretrial Order by April 24, 2019. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/21/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting 53 Motion to Seal; ORDER granting 56 Motion to Seal; ECF 38-12 and 55-12 will be unsealed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER that 41 Stipulation for Extension of Time is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting 42 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond re: 35 Motion for Summary Judgment and 37 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Responses due by 6/25/2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 33 Stipulation to Extend Deadlines. Motions due by 5/14/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/14/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting 31 Stipulation to Extend Discovery. Motions due by 5/4/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/4/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting 29 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Wells Fargo Card Services. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/8/2018.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting 27 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice as to American Honda Finance Corp. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/18/2017.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER Granting 25 Stipulation for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Specialized Loan Servicing LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Finance Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Card Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy A. Garcia
Represented By: Miles N Clark
Represented By: Matthew I Knepper
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?