Bacon v. Cox et al

Plaintiff: Percy Lavae Bacon
Defendant: James Cox, Frank Dreesen, Kristopher Ledingham, Joseph Lewis, State of Nevada and Brian Williams
Case Number: 2:2017cv01744
Filed: June 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
0 Judge: Richard F. Boulware
1 Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER that this action is dismissed without prejudice based on Plaintiff's failure to pay the $400.00 filing fee in compliance with this Court's 1/24/2018 and 2/9/2018 orders. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/29/2018., Case terminated. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 USCA, Ninth Circuit ORDER. This court has reviewed the notice of appeal filed 2/23/2018. Appeal No. 18-15359 is dismissed. This order served on the district court for the District of Nevada shall constitute the mandate of this court. DISMISSED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that the 6 Motion to Alter or Amend is construed as a Motion for Reconsideration and Denied. This action will be dismissed without prejudice unless Plaintiff pays the $400.00 filing fee in full within 15 days of entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 1 and 3 Motions/Applications for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. This action will be dismissed without prejudice unless Plaintiff pays the $400.00 filing fee in full within 30 days of entry of this Orde r. The Clerk of the Court shall retain the 1 -1 Complaint. Plaintiff's 2 Motion to Extend Prison Copy Work Limit is Denied without prejudice at this time. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - 2 copies of Order mailed to Plaintiff - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bacon v. Cox et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Percy Lavae Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Dreesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristopher Ledingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?