Deutsche Bank National Trust v. Edward Kielty Trust et al
Plaintiff: |
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company |
Defendant: |
Canyon Trails Homeowners Association, Edward Kielty Trust and Terra West Collections Group, LLC |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv01759 |
Filed: |
June 26, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Peggy A. Leen |
Presiding Judge: |
Richard F. Boulware |
Nature of Suit: |
Constitutional - State Statute |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 25, 2020 |
Filing
65
ORDER granting 54 Motion for Reconsideration: The Court quiets title and declares that Defendant Edward Kielty Trust acquired the property subject to Deutsche Bank's deed of trust. Further Ordered that the 52 Court's prior holding th at whether Defendant Edward Kielty is a bona fide purchaser is a question of fact is stricken from the March 31, 2019 Order in light of this Orders analysis. It is also Ordered he notice of 4 lis pendens filed in this case be expunged. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/25/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
|
March 31, 2019 |
Filing
52
ORDER Granting Deutsche Bank National Trust Company's 49 Motion for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authorities. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to file the Notice of Supplemental Authorities at ECF No. 49-1. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Edward Kielty Trust's 33 Motion for Summary Judgmentis GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Canyon Trails Homeowners Association's 37 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. I T IS FURTHER ORDERED that Deutsche Bank National Trust Company's 34 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a status conference is set in the case for May 15, 2019 at 4:00 PM in LV Courtroom 7C to set the trial date. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/31/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
|
March 8, 2018 |
Filing
32
ORDER Granting 31 Second Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 4/11/2018. Motions due by 5/11/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
February 9, 2018 |
Filing
30
ORDER Granting 27 Stipulation to Extend Discovery (First Request). Discovery due by 3/12/2018. Motions due by 4/11/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
December 21, 2017 |
Filing
24
ORDER Granting 23 Stipulation to Set Aside Default as to Defendant Canyon Trails Homeowners Association Re: 21 Clerk's Entry of Default. The Parties stipulate that HOA will file a Response in this matter by 12/26/2017 or default will again be entered against HOA. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?