Nationstar Mortgage LLC v. East Trop 2073 Trust et al
Plaintiff: |
Nationstar Mortgage LLC |
Defendant: |
Canyon Willow Trop Owners' Association and East Trop 2073 Trust |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv01769 |
Filed: |
June 27, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Miranda M. Du |
Presiding Judge: |
Carl W. Hoffman |
Nature of Suit: |
Real Property: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 8, 2019 |
Filing
70
ORDER that Defendant East Trop 2073 Trust's motion for relief from judgment (ECF No. 55 ) is denied. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/8/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
February 12, 2019 |
Filing
48
ORDER that Nationstar's remaining claims as asserted against Purchaser are dismissed as moot; the Purchaser's motion to set aside the Clerk's entry of default (ECF No. 40 ) is denied as moot; Clerk directed to enter judg ment in favor of Nationstar declaring that the foreclosure sale at issue in this case did not extinguish Fannie Mae's first deed of trust; Clerk directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
February 6, 2019 |
Filing
45
ORDER that Nationstar's motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 25 ) is granted; Clerk directed to enter judgment in favor of Nationstar on its first and second claims for relief brought pursuant to the Federal Foreclosure Bar; Nationstar&# 039;s status report due by 2/11/2019; and the HOA's motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 26) is granted in part and denied in part. See order pdf for more details and instructions. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/6/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
January 30, 2019 |
Filing
43
ORDER granting ECF No. 42 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Opposition to ECF No. 40 Motion to Set Aside. Opposition/Response due by 2/5/2019. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/30/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
|
May 14, 2018 |
Filing
37
ORDER granting ECF No. 36 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Replies in Support of Motions for Summary Judgment (ECF Nos. 25 & 26 ). Replies due by 5/24/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
April 12, 2018 |
Filing
29
ORDER granting ECF No. 27 Substitution of Counsel for Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. Melanie D. Morgan and Donna M. Wittig of Akerman, LLP in place and stead of Regina A. Habermas and Dana Jonathon Nitz of Wright, Finlay & Zak, LLP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
|
September 26, 2017 |
Filing
11
ORDER granting Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. 10 ) : Plaintiff granted an additional 60 days to serve Defendant East Trop 2073 Trust. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/26/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?