Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB v. Saticoy Bay LLC Series 9338 Wilderness Glen Avenue et al
Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Defendant: Saticoy Bay LLC Series 9338 Wilderness Glen Avenue and Yellowstone Homeowners Association
Case Number: 2:2017cv01775
Filed: June 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that Wilmington's motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 38 ) be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Saticoy Bay's motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 39 ) be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to Local Rule 16-5, this matter is REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler for a settlement conference. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/15/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Granting 107 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Reply to 106 Supplement. Replies due by 3/4/2022. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/25/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER Granting 102 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) re 99 Order, re 70 Order on Motion to Reconsideration. Supplement due by 2/2/2022. Replies due by 2/9/2022. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/10/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER - Wilmington has 14 days from the date of this order to file a supplement to its 70 motion for reconsideration, if any. If Wilmington does file a supplement, Saticoy Bay has 7 days to file a response, if any. Both the supplement and response are limited to the issue of prejudice and are limited to five pages. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/29/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER Granting 85 Stipulation to Withdraw 76 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/15/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER Granting 83 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 76 Motion for Reconsideration (First Request). Replies due by 4/13/2020. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/2/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Granting 79 Stipulation for Extension of Time re: 76 Motion for Reconsideration (First Request). Responses due by 3/25/2020. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/12/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 38 Wilmington's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 39 Saticoy Bay's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/29/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting 40 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 38 , 39 Motions for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 10/29/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 11 defendant's motion to dismiss be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 14 plaintiff's motion for leave to conduct discovery be, and the same hereby is, DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB v. Saticoy Bay LLC Series 9338 Wilderness Glen Avenue et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saticoy Bay LLC Series 9338 Wilderness Glen Avenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yellowstone Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Represented By: Regina A. Habermas
Represented By: Christina Miller
Represented By: Dana Jonathon Nitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?